U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abraham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulated Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver-Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waive Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment Letter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Continuing Release/Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Signature Page]
  • April 03, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.