U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Levy et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Public Option)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Stipulated Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulated Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment Letter]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order re Due Process Protections Act (text only event)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment (text only)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Invocation of Rights at Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order for Issuance of Arrest Warrant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Continuing Release/Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.