U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10976-
  • Case Name: A S E Farvolden Fairfax
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [Receipt of Fee for Final Installment]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [Receipt of Fee (Generic)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [Notice of Required Documents (BNC)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [Repeat Filer]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shoemaker, Kathleen V [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.