U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00690
  • Case Name: Nuri v. True Religion Apparel, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Verification of State Court Records]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges]
  • April 25, 2025: [LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM)]
  • April 25, 2025: [LK Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent Letter & Form]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case/IFP Deficiency Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 16, 2025: [Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.