U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kohler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [zMemorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Court Only Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [z(Court Only) Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Charges and Penalties]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.