U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-04055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rubio
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util-Interpreter Required]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.