U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order AO 199c]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal & Substitution - USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.