U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00701
  • Case Name: Buckingham v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Return Receipt (Green Card)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Declaration (non motion)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Directing Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Directing Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Declaration (non motion)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on IFP and Payments re: In Custody Prisoners]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Document-Pro Se/ Prisoner]
  • April 18, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.