U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00705
  • Case Name: Bruce v. Sellen Construction Co., Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Jury Demand]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Verification of State Court Records]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Declaration (non motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.