U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01946
  • Case Name: Granger et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment by Court]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to Circuit]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 26, 2025: [Amend]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date]
  • April 25, 2025: [Receipt]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials with the Clerk]
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.