U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00708
  • Case Name: Doe 4 v. Lyons et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Consolidation Order - for Member cases only]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [TRO Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [2 - Minute Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [2 - Minute Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.