U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00759
  • Case Name: Liu et al v. LaserAway Medical Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.