U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-05333
  • Case Name: He v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [DGE - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Stipulated Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Stipulated Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminate Motions (Public)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [TRO Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [2 - Minute Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [2 - Minute Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice re Pro Se Registration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.