U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-02049-4
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reopen Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order AO 199c]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util-Interpreter Required]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Following Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util-Interpreter Required]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util-Interpreter Required]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Rights]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Unavailability of Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appointment Order - Non-Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.