U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00730
  • Case Name: National Products Inc. v. Dovey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge]
  • April 25, 2025: [TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures]
  • April 25, 2025: [TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.