U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01057-
  • Case Name: Wood v. Suseyi et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [~generic~ Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Received UNSIGNED Order]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Shorten Time]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proof of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Mediation Certification (ADR)]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons and Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint (fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.