U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00733-13
  • Case Name: Suzanne Louise Van Woerkom and Andreas T J Van Woerkom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Certification of Service of Trustee's Private Noticing Center]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Declaration Regarding Payments (LBR 1007-1)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Withdrawal of Motion or Other Pleading (text only or add pdf)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Make Chapter 13 Plan Payments Directly to Trustee (text only or add pdf)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Notice of Payment]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Declaration Regarding Payments (LBR 1007-1)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Ch 13 - Certificate Re Payments and Disbursements]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Ch 13 - Chapter 7 Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Ch 13 - Plan Funding Analysis]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Ch 13 - Plan Payment Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Ch 13 - Flat Fee Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Ch 13 - Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Statement of Witness]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Todd, Mike I [Statement of Social Security Number (will only be viewable by the court, trustee, USTR)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.