U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40960-
  • Case Name: Sandra DeFeo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Certificate of Financial Management Course for Debtor]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [341 Notice Prepare]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Notice of Deficient Filing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Approving Payment of Filing Fee in Installments text only (order)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Creditors Uploaded]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Social Security Number(s) Statement - PDF viewable by court only]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (OTC)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Malaier, Michael G. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.