U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00746
  • Case Name: Kikkert v. State of Washington et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment by Court]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Cross Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Verification of State Court Records]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Order (Unsigned)]
  • April 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures]
  • April 25, 2025: [TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Consent Letter & Form]
  • April 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice re Pro Se Registration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.