open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00650
    Party Name:Cruz v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - Miscellaneous (Do Not Use for Social Security)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response To Court Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Extend Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Amend]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time To File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response In Opposition]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [2255 Notice]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Number Not Used In Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227737
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =