U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Sharpe v. Feck et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.