Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00203
    Party Name:Williams v. SDI of Jackson, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reopening Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Dismiss on Settlement]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Summary Judgment - Response Time]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Position Regarding Settlement]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Endorsement]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer due deadline]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Document NOTED]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 14, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57507
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =