U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 03, 2019: [Status Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • August 08, 2019: [Unopposed Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Unopposed Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • August 04, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • August 04, 2019: [Expedite ]
  • August 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Arrest - PC]
  • August 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.