U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swain
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed]
  • August 14, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 14, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Arrest]
  • August 02, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.