U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-13203
  • Case Name: Ervin Fitzgerald Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [13 Final Report and Account]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Affidavit]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Statement of Intention]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order Revoke Payroll Deduction (Tr 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order and Notice of Conversion]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice Convert Ch. 13 to Ch. 7]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice Convert Ch. 13 to Ch. 7]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.