U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 18, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 04, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 04, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 30, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 29, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2019: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 01, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2019: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 12, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 31, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 20, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 25, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 24, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 12, 2017: [Violation Report]
February, 2015
  • February 02, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.