Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Combined Answering and Reply]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Combined Opening and Answering]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Preclude]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order - -Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Markman Hearing]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Request for Oral Argument]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Surreply Brief]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency re Redacted Documents]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Reply Brief]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Answering Brief]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Appendix]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Opening Brief]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Response to Objections]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Hearing]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Chart]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Reply]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Motions No Longer Referred ]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - Patent]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00546
    Party Name:Evolved Wireless, LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57336

Post Your Comment or Question

1 x 1 =