U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kuligowski
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 04, 2020: [Remark]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 09, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • March 01, 2020: [--Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 10, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 06, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2018: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • December 06, 2018: [--Transcript]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 24, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • October 22, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • October 22, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • October 22, 2018: [Warrant ]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • February 09, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 12, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 04, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.