U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 30, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 24, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 22, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.