U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • June 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • May 28, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • May 28, 2021: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • May 28, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • April 19, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.