U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 30, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • April 24, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.