U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mercedes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [--Transcript]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Upward Departure]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 21, 2018: [Oral Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • September 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • August 30, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • August 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 20, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Petition to Show Cause re Bail Revocation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Bail]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [--Transcript]
  • July 25, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Upward Departure]
  • July 19, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 08, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 01, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 21, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 20, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.