U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • February 26, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • February 26, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • February 26, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 09, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.