U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arano-Ramon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • June 22, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • June 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 21, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.