U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez Escobar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 06, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 06, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 06, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 29, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.