U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wozniak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • March 17, 2020: [--Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2019: [Status Report ]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • February 22, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Protective Order]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 18, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.