U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Omolewa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Remark]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order of Garnishment]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Service]
  • November 15, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order of Garnishment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Writ]
  • October 17, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.