U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lyons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 02, 2020: [Exit Record]
  • April 02, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 05, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.