U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melendrez-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 16, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • November 16, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 19, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 18, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.