U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • October 02, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2018: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.