U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 07, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • November 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 07, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • November 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 17, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 13, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.