U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santizo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 17, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • January 17, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • January 17, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 24, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 19, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.