U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena-Pozo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 18, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.