U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuertes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 12, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 12, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • March 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 14, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.