U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villa - Castaneda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • June 04, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • June 04, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • June 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 30, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 25, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.