U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 16, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 16, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Interpreter Requested]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 20, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.