U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 14, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 14, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Exclude]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 20, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.