U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes Herrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 06, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 10, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.