U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 10, 2021: [Exit Record]
  • August 10, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 17, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [--Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • December 12, 2019: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • December 12, 2019: [In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 12, 2019: [USCA Letter to District Court Clerk]
  • December 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 25, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 19, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 15, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 13, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Oral Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 13, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.