U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Springer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 18, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.